NY S08741 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement of the state liquor authority to have not more than two members of the authority belong to the same political party.
Title
Removes the requirement of the state liquor authority to have not more than two members of the authority belong to the same political party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.768 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10387 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - referred to economic development