NY S08730 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau to discontinue use of certain lands as parkland located in the county's Bay Park to be used for a force main from the city of Long Beach to the Bay Park sewage treatment plant and to authorize the city of Long Beach to convey to the county of Nassau an easement through land located in the city's Veteran's Memorial Park to be used for a force main from the City of Long Beach to the Bay Park sewage treatment plant.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau to discontinue use of certain lands as parkland located in the county's Bay Park to be used for a force main from the city of Long Beach to the Bay Park sewage treatment plant and to authorize the city of Long Beach to convey to the county of Nassau an easement through land located in the city's Veteran's Memorial Park to be used for a force main from the City of Long Beach to the Bay Park sewage treatment plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.165 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.343 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a10802 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.952 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10802 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.165