NY S08684 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Frank Pallett to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of State University of New York police officer, notwithstanding the age restrictions of section 58 of the civil service law.
Title
Authorizes Frank Pallett to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of State University of New York police officer, notwithstanding the age restrictions of section 58 of the civil service law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1398 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |