NY S08678 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Seneca county attorney to reside in a county in New York adjoining Seneca county.
Title
Allows the Seneca county attorney to reside in a county in New York adjoining Seneca county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9360 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1046 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09360 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.244