NY S08678 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9814
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in the sanitary facilities at truck stops.
Title
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in the sanitary facilities at truck stops.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9814 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1672 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09814 (Same As) 2022-07-20 - signed chap.391