NY S08660 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.369
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10679b
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1735
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 8660B
2018-06-06SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-05-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 8660A
2018-05-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-05-10SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10679 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8660b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08660&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08660&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08660
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08660&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08660A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08660&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08660B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8660#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S8660#SC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08660&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback