NY A10679 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8660b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8660b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to alienate certain parcels of land used as parklands and to dedicate other lands as parklands.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8660b |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.369 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.369 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10679b |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | print number 10679a |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08660 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.507