NY S08640 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes funding to local government entities from the urban development corporation through the electric generation facility cessation mitigation fund for an additional three years.
Title
Authorizes funding to local government entities from the urban development corporation through the electric generation facility cessation mitigation fund for an additional three years.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1214 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08956 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - referred to local governments