NY S08632 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the geriatric service demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration within the program.
Title
Authorizes the geriatric service demonstration program to promote mental health and home care collaboration within the program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10938 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1480 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A10938 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.305