NY S08617 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.776
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.776
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to annual reporting requirements of the state long-term care ombudsman; requires additional information to be contained in the state ombudsman's annual reports to the governor, state legislature, etc.; requires an additional annual report to be submitted to the attorney general on instances of abuse, neglect and exploitation, for review and possible enforcement action.
Title
Relates to annual reporting requirements of the state long-term care ombudsman; requires additional information to be contained in the state ombudsman's annual reports to the governor, state legislature, etc.; requires an additional annual report to be submitted to the attorney general on instances of abuse, neglect and exploitation, for review and possible enforcement action.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.776 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.635 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10045a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8617A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.977 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A10045 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8617a