NY S08534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs promulgation of rules and regulations concerning removal of ticks from pupils and notification to parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs promulgation of rules and regulations concerning removal of ticks from pupils and notification to parents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to education
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1156
2018-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A11141 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback