NY S08493 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Title
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1877 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8493A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2018-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A11124 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES