NY A11124 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Title
Relates to identifying lands at risk from sea level rise or flooding as eligible sending districts.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.214 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.214 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08493 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES