NY S08485 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the equalization of retirement benefits for police officers across New York state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the equalization of retirement benefits for police officers across New York state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 8485B
2018-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-06-04SenateAMENDED 8485A
2018-05-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1394
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10716 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - print number 10716b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback