NY A10716 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 10716b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - print number 10716b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the equalization of retirement benefits for police officers across New York state.
Title
Relates to the equalization of retirement benefits for police officers across New York state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10716b |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | print number 10716a |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08485 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES