NY S08483 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of permanent COVID-19 memorials; establishes a COVID-19 permanent memorial fund.
Title
Authorizes the establishment of permanent COVID-19 memorials; establishes a COVID-19 permanent memorial fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1504 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09815 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - referred to governmental operations