NY S08454 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.6839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.6839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2010, relating to prevailing wages for service workers.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2010, relating to prevailing wages for service workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 54 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-23 | VETOED MEMO.6839 | |
2010-12-15 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-11-30 | returned to senate | |
2010-11-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-11-30 | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 | |
2010-11-30 | substituted for a11672 | |
2010-08-04 | referred to labor | |
2010-08-03 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-08-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-08-03 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1437 | |
2010-07-27 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11672 (Same As) 2010-11-30 - substituted by s8454