NY S08425 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process for designating transfer-on-death beneficiaries for farming implements involving filing a document with the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Title
Establishes a process for designating transfer-on-death beneficiaries for farming implements involving filing a document with the commissioner of agriculture and markets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1454 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10433 (Same As) 2024-05-24 - referred to agriculture