NY S08417 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bond anticipation notes issued in calendar years 2015 through 2021; authorizes the expenditure and temporary transfer of reserve funds for expenses related to COVID-19; authorizes the extension of repayment of inter-fund advances made for expenses related to COVID-19.
Title
Relates to bond anticipation notes issued in calendar years 2015 through 2021; authorizes the expenditure and temporary transfer of reserve funds for expenses related to COVID-19; authorizes the extension of repayment of inter-fund advances made for expenses related to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.157 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.668 |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8417 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-05-27 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.44 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | rules report cal.44 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | reported |
2020-05-27 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-22 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10492 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.668 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10492 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.157