NY S08378 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11568
Status: Introduced on June 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11568
Summary
Relates to fraud enforcement.
Title
Relates to fraud enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A11568 | |
2010-06-29 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1370 | |
2010-06-27 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11568 (Same As) 2010-08-13 - signed chap.379
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08378&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |