NY A11568 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fraud enforcement.
Title
Relates to fraud enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.379 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-30 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-30 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-30 | 3RD READING CAL.1370 | |
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8378 | |
2010-06-30 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-30 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-30 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-29 | ordered to third reading rules cal.469 | |
2010-06-29 | rules report cal.469 | |
2010-06-29 | reported | |
2010-06-29 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-27 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08378 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11568