NY S08373 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts credit card debt from the definition of medical debt unless the credit card is issued under an open-ended or closed-ended plan offered specifically for the payment of health care services, products, or devices provided to a person.
Title
Exempts credit card debt from the definition of medical debt unless the credit card is issued under an open-ended or closed-ended plan offered specifically for the payment of health care services, products, or devices provided to a person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.19 |
2024-11-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.514 |
2024-11-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.77 |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9438 |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.361 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8373A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2024-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09438 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - substituted by s8373a