CO HB1372 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room LSB-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room LSB-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning regulating the use of prone restraint by law enforcement.
Title
Regulating Law Enforcement Use of Prone Restraint
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1372 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1372, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1372, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 23 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 20 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1372 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1372, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1372, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |