NY S08344 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the carrier or employer a credit against permanent partial disability benefits for temporary partial disability payments made in excess of 130 weeks.
Title
Provides the carrier or employer a credit against permanent partial disability benefits for temporary partial disability payments made in excess of 130 weeks.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2024-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.443 |
2024-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A08950 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - referred to labor