NY S08303 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8803D
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8803D
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid to Localities Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8803D |
2024-04-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.846 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8303D |
2024-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8303C |
2024-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8303B |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8303A |
2024-02-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08803 (Same As) 2024-05-01 - thru line veto memo.15