NY S08287 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to standing to file paternity petitions, necessary parties in paternity cases and vacating acknowledgments of paternity regarding an alleged father when the mother has signed an acknowledgment of paternity with another man.
Title
Relates to standing to file paternity petitions, necessary parties in paternity cases and vacating acknowledgments of paternity regarding an alleged father when the mother has signed an acknowledgment of paternity with another man.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1323 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |