NY S08275 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10468B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10468B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the reclassification of controlled substances by regulation; authorizes the commissioner of health to reclassify controlled substances by regulation or emergency regulation if the substance is redesignated or rescheduled.
Title
Relates to authorizing the reclassification of controlled substances by regulation; authorizes the commissioner of health to reclassify controlled substances by regulation or emergency regulation if the substance is redesignated or rescheduled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10468B |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1874 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8275B |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8275A |
2018-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10468 (Same As) 2018-07-31 - signed chap.164