NY S08260 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of and engagement with parents in proceedings involving sixteen and seventeen year old defendants in youth parts of superior courts.
Title
Relates to notification of and engagement with parents in proceedings involving sixteen and seventeen year old defendants in youth parts of superior courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1010 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10855 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - referred to codes