NY S08212 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority conduct a study on the feasibility, storing and transferring of hydrogen energy to residential and commercial structures in cities and towns with a population greater than twenty thousand.
Title
Requires the New York state energy research and development authority conduct a study on the feasibility, storing and transferring of hydrogen energy to residential and commercial structures in cities and towns with a population greater than twenty thousand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.444 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |