NY S08182 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed pharmacists to administer a vaccine for COVID-19 approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration Center for Biologics Evaulation and Research vaccine product approval process.
Title
Authorizes licensed pharmacists to administer a vaccine for COVID-19 approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration Center for Biologics Evaulation and Research vaccine product approval process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.110 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.47 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted for a10508a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.647 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2020-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8182A |
2020-05-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10508 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.110