NY S08171 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires for construction activities that require a state pollutant discharge elimination system permit owners and operators to submit a copy of the required public notice; requires each county receiving such notice to make such notice publicly available on its website.
Title
Requires for construction activities that require a state pollutant discharge elimination system permit owners and operators to submit a copy of the required public notice; requires each county receiving such notice to make such notice publicly available on its website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.134 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |