NY S08158 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10830
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of chapter 563 of the laws of 2001 relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification demonstration program.
Title
Extends the provisions of chapter 563 of the laws of 2001 relating to providing for an emergency technician 5 year re-certification demonstration program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10830 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED 1501A |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1501 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10830 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - signed chap.102