NY S08119 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to railroad safety; requires joint inspection of traffic signals; increases penalties for the failure to comply with regulations; aligns railroad bridge inspection requirements with federal regulations; establishes and increases penalties for failure to obey certain signals and stops.
Title
Relates to railroad safety; requires joint inspection of traffic signals; increases penalties for the failure to comply with regulations; aligns railroad bridge inspection requirements with federal regulations; establishes and increases penalties for failure to obey certain signals and stops.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.20 |
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.501 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10714 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1925 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10714 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s8119