NY S08118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 8118B
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits negative credit reporting on consumers who have suffered financial harm as a result of the declared state of emergency relating to the coronavirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits negative credit reporting on consumers who have suffered financial harm as a result of the declared state of emergency relating to the coronavirus.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-18SenatePRINT NUMBER 8118B
2020-05-18SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2020-05-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 8118A
2020-05-04SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2020-03-23SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A10183 (Same As) 2020-05-22 - print number 10183a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback