NY S08073 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies certain requirements for issuing civil service examination announcements.
Title
Clarifies certain requirements for issuing civil service examination announcements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.74 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.220 |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | substituted for a8513 |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2024-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.57 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08513 (Same As) 2024-01-31 - substituted by s8073