NY S08041 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies what littering on state park lands includes; exempts the use of ash, sand and salt for the purpose of reducing hazards on roads caused by snow and ice.
Title
Clarifies what littering on state park lands includes; exempts the use of ash, sand and salt for the purpose of reducing hazards on roads caused by snow and ice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8527 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.181 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08527 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - signed chap.37