NY S08028 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of double-bunked housing in correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to correction
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1728
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 8028A
2018-05-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2018-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A10173 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - print number 10173a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback