NY S08015 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-08 - SIGNED CHAP.298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability benefits for certain members of the New York city fire department pension fund; presumes performance of duty for certain illnesses; authorizes the board of trustees of the New York city fire department pension fund to draw upon the assets of such fund to pay expenses.
Title
Relates to disability benefits for certain members of the New York city fire department pension fund; presumes performance of duty for certain illnesses; authorizes the board of trustees of the New York city fire department pension fund to draw upon the assets of such fund to pay expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.298 |
2016-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.467 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10567 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1473 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10567 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s8015