NY S08011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Trooper Katsur to receive state police retirement credit for services performed as a SUNY police officer.
Title
Authorizes Trooper Katsur to receive state police retirement credit for services performed as a SUNY police officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.365 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10218 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1955 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10218 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8011