NY S07951 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.493
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to adopt regulations for hunting in the northern zone.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to adopt regulations for hunting in the northern zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.493 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1089 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a10862 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.989 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10862 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - substituted by s7951