NY S07949 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the aging in place council to study and provide recommendations to promote aging in place.
Title
Establishes the aging in place council to study and provide recommendations to promote aging in place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2018-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7949B |
2018-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7949A |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1120 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A10069 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - print number 10069a