NY S07934 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.476
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Erie to transfer and convey Beeman Creek Park to the town of Clarence, county of Erie.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Erie to transfer and convey Beeman Creek Park to the town of Clarence, county of Erie.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-30 SIGNED CHAP.476
2010-08-18 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-30 returned to senate
2010-06-30 passed assembly
2010-06-30 home rule request
2010-06-30 home rule request
2010-06-30 ordered to third reading rules cal.494
2010-06-30 substituted for a11221b
2010-06-25 referred to ways and means
2010-06-25 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-25 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-25 HOME RULE REQUEST
2010-06-25 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1273
2010-06-25 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-10 PRINT NUMBER 7934B
2010-06-10 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2010-05-26 PRINT NUMBER 7934A
2010-05-26 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2010-05-25 REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A11221 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - substituted by s7934b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback