NY S07911 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Congregation Lubavitch-Chabad House of Huntington Township, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Congregation Lubavitch-Chabad House of Huntington Township, Inc. to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.226 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.418 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10395b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1664 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7911C |
2016-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7911B |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7911A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10395 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7911c