NY S07883 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for an emergency medical technician to act as a designated camp health director or to provide health services in assistance to the camp health director at children's camps and camps for children with developmental disabilities; allows for children's camps and camps for children with developmental disabilities to contract with licensed medical professionals to provide professional services during any period in which the camp has a valid permit to operate.
Title
Allows for an emergency medical technician to act as a designated camp health director or to provide health services in assistance to the camp health director at children's camps and camps for children with developmental disabilities; allows for children's camps and camps for children with developmental disabilities to contract with licensed medical professionals to provide professional services during any period in which the camp has a valid permit to operate.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8773 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.297 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08773 (Same As) 2022-03-18 - signed chap.142