NY S07871 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to regional tuition rates for special education itinerant services.
Title
Relates to regional tuition rates for special education itinerant services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1583 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |