NY S07845 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the issuance of pet insurance that provides coverage for accidents and illnesses of pets.
Title
Provides for the issuance of pet insurance that provides coverage for accidents and illnesses of pets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8276 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1256 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08276 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY