NY S07845 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the lease of space on certain sports field fences in the town of Yorktown, in the county of Westchester.
Title
Authorizes the lease of space on certain sports field fences in the town of Yorktown, in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.177 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.829 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7845 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | rules report cal.133 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-03-04 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10012 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.829 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10012 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.177