NY S07837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10074
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to Buffalo sewer authority bonds, increasing the total amount of bonds which may be issued and outstanding at one time.
Title
Relates to Buffalo sewer authority bonds, increasing the total amount of bonds which may be issued and outstanding at one time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10074 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2143 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10074 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.244