NY S07833 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8467A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8467A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes xylazine and other substances in the definition of drug adulterant testing supplies for the purposes of the dispensing of such supplies by health care professionals or pharmacists to any person.
Title
Includes xylazine and other substances in the definition of drug adulterant testing supplies for the purposes of the dispensing of such supplies by health care professionals or pharmacists to any person.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Sen. Robert Rolison [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8467A |
2024-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7833A |
2024-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS |
2023-12-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08467 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY