NY S07826 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11343
Status: Introduced on May 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11343
Summary
Extends the provisions of chapter 545 of the laws of 2003 relating to the assisted living program.
Title
Extends the provisions of chapter 545 of the laws of 2003 relating to the assisted living program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | SUBSTITUTED BY A11343 | |
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.879 | |
2010-05-14 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A11343 (Same As) 2010-08-13 - signed chap.374
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07826&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |